FL S1386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who is required to make certain reports concerning sexual misconduct with a student from knowingly or willfully failing to make such report or knowingly or willfully preventing another person from doing so; prohibiting a person from knowingly or willfully submitting inaccurate, incomplete, or untruthful information with respect to a report concerning sexual misconduct with a student; specifying that certain instructional and noninstructional personnel must file fingerprints with the employing entity or alternative school, as applicable, rather than the district school board; providing that certain procedures established by district school superintendents set the standards of service to be offered to the public within the meaning of a specified provision and are not subject to the collective bargaining process, etc.
Title
School Personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1830 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1505 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1203 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
H1505 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1203 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
800 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |