FL S1384 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain Supreme Court Justices to have an appropriate facility in their district of residence designated as their official headquarters; increasing the limit of the amount in controversy in certain actions at law under which the county court has original jurisdiction of such actions; providing for adjustments to the limit at specified intervals due to inflation or deflation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-20SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-02-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7061 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
H5301 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S248 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S1396 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7061

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback