FL S1384 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Corrections to develop and administer a reentry program for nonviolent offenders which is intended to divert nonviolent offenders from long periods of incarceration; requiring the department to notify the nonviolent offender's sentencing court to obtain approval before the nonviolent offender is placed into the reentry program; requiring that assessments of vocational skills and future career education be provided to the offender; providing that the section does not create a right to placement in the reentry program or any right to placement or early release under supervision of any type, etc.
Title
Inmate Reentry
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7070 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
S7068 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
S7068 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1384 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1384/BillText/Filed/HTML |