FL S1380 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies provisions concerning regional offices. Provides for a management agreement under which the lottery may be operated. Provides limits on the games that may be offered under such an agreement. Provides for collection of funds in excess of a specified baseline growth percentage to ensure that the manager does not earn excess revenue. Provides for designation of a manager by the Governor. Provides that there is no prohibition on additional legislative authorization of other forms of gambling, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operation of the Florida Lottery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 103
2011-03-07 Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 103
2011-02-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1059 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
241153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24124Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback