FL S1378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1523 (Ch. 2021-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1523 (Ch. 2021-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Combating Corporate Espionage in Florida Act"; prohibiting theft of a trade secret; prohibiting trafficking in trade secrets; providing criminal penalties; reclassifying the criminal penalty and increasing the offense severity ranking for an offense committed with specified intent, etc.
Title
Corporate Espionage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1523 (Ch. 2021-75) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted HB 1523 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1523 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-75
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
812 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |