FL S1374 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting registered nurses from clinical laboratory personnel licensure requirements under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Clinical Laboratory Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#813 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-37 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H931 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1374