FL S1370 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7051
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Re-creating the Land Acquisition Trust Fund within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services without modification, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Land Acquisition Trust Fund/Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7051
2018-03-01SenateSubstituted HB 7051
2018-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-21SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-31SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/18, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-12-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7051 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-115

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20142Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback