FL S1370 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Calculating a school district's class size categorical allocation reduction at the school average when maximum class size requirements are not met, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maximum Class Size

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Education
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2013-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0189 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S0826 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback