FL S1366 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7135 -SJ 920
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7135 -SJ 920
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the Department of Economic Opportunity prepare, or contract with an entity to prepare, an economic security report of employment and earning outcomes for degrees or certificates earned at a public postsecondary educational institution; providing duties of the State Board of Education relating to the 5-year plan for postsecondary enrollment and the strategic plan that specifies goals and objectives for public schools and Florida College System institutions; requiring that the State Board of Education identify performance metrics for the Florida College System and develop a plan specifying goals and objectives for each Florida College System institution, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations | Senate Education Pre-K - 12 Committee | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7135 -SJ 920 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 919 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/12 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 766 | |
2012-03-01 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 753 | |
2012-03-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations, 02/28/12, 2:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | Recalled from Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 674 | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 518 | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 289 | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Higher Education -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-25 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/24/12, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 147 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 147 | |
2011-12-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |