FL S1356 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain criminal offenders may enlist in the military in lieu of incarceration under certain circumstances; specifying requirements for the offender's military service; providing for resentencing if requirements are not met, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Service Option for Certain Criminal Offenders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Criminal Justice; Rules
2021-12-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H187 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
92100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback