FL S1356 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the initial rate that certain client companies of employee leasing companies must pay under specified circumstances to tax collection service providers; requiring the tax collection service provider to adjust the initial employer contribution rate under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Employer Contributions for Reemployment Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1253 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |