FL S1356 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative intent concerning transition to adulthood services for youth in the custody of the DJJ. Provides eligibility for services from both departments for youth served by the DJJ who are legally in the custody of the DCFS. Provides that certain services require voluntary participation by affected youth and are not intended to create an involuntary court-sanctioned residential commitment, etc.
Title
Transitional Services for Youth [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0053 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-29 | In Messages | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01081; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 01082 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00957 | |
2010-04-16 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00635; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00552 | |
2010-04-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00559 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00349; Now in Judiciary -SJ 00349 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-10 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00096 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0627 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0985 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 0301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 461 | New Code | See Bill Text |