FL S1350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain confidential information held by in-hospital medical staff committees of public hospitals; providing an exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of meetings held by such medical staff committees during which such confidential information is discussed; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records and Meetings/In-hospital Medical Staff Committees
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H869 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee