FL S1348 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to review and update a specified report on the regulation of certain auxiliary containers, wrappings, and disposable plastic bags; prohibiting a local government, local governmental agency, or state government agency from enacting certain rules and regulations during a specified timeframe, etc.
Title
Recyclable Materials
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1563 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S694 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-125
S694 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-125
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1348 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1348/BillText/Filed/HTML |