FL S1344 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2021-221)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2021-221)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adding offenses concerning elderly persons and disabled adults to the authority of the Office of Statewide Prosecution; providing that a person who has been convicted of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an elderly person or a disabled adult is not qualified to act as a personal representative; providing for forfeiture of specified benefits of persons who have been convicted of certain offenses involving elderly persons or disabled adults; specifying additional conduct that constitutes exploitation of an elderly person or a disabled adult, etc.
Title
Protection of Elderly Persons and Disabled Adults
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2021-221) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1041 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1041 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-221
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 8031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
733 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
825 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
825 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
825 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
825 | 1035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |