FL S1344 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain facilities that have been granted a certificate-of-need exemption to demonstrate and maintain compliance with specified criteria; providing an exemption from a certificate-of-need requirement for certain intermediate care facilities; limiting the number of such exemptions the Agency for Health Care Administration may grant, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intermediate Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#710 (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-60
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 79 NAYS 36
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 8
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenateAmendment(s) adopted (952648)
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-29SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-01-28SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-12-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1163 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1344, CS/SB 82 passed
S82 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-71

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400962Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback