FL S1342 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a district school board issuing a bond to determine the schedule of maturities of the bond. Deletes a provision requiring payments on a bond to be as nearly equal as practicable. Extends to 30 years from 20 years the maximum permissible term of a bond that may be issued by a district school board without approval from the Department of Education. Extends the maximum duration of the levy of ad valorem taxes approved by the electors of a school district for the operating expenses of the district, etc.
Title
School District Financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 100 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 100 | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1093 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1010 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1342 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1342/BillText/Filed/HTML |