FL S1338 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Applying provisions relating to the determination of venue in proceedings for the appointment of a guardian to minors; requiring that a court dismiss a petition for determination of incapacity if all members of the examining committee conclude that the person is not incapacitated, unless a certain motion is filed within a specified period, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianship

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Messages
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-26HouseIn Messages
2019-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-01SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-19SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1085 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7441097Amended CodeSee Bill Text
744331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7443701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback