FL S1334 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1375 (Ch. 2023-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting battery by strangulation; providing applicability, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Battery by Strangulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1375 (Ch. 2023-237)
2023-05-01SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1375
2023-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
2023-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-24SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2023-04-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2023-04-13SenateNow in Rules
2023-04-12SenateFavorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2023-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2023-03-22SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2023-03-22SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules
2023-03-22SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary
2023-03-21SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2023-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-03-20SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-03-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2023-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1375 (Same As) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-237

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
784031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Amendment/702232/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Analyses/2023s01334.pre.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Analyses/2023s01334.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Analyses/2023s01334.pre.acj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Analyses/2023s01334.acj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Analyses/2023s01334.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Analyses/2023s01334.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Vote/2023-03-20%200330PM~S01334%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Vote/2023-04-12%201130AM~S01334%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1334/Vote/2023-04-24%200100PM~S01334%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback