FL S1332 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing local governments to enact rates to tow or immobilize vessels on private property and to remove and store vessels under specified circumstances; prohibiting counties from enacting certain ordinances or rules that impose fees or charges on authorized wrecker operators or towing businesses; authorizing certain persons to place liens on vehicles or vessels to recover specified fees or charges; revising requirements regarding notices and signs concerning the towing or removal of vehicles or vessels, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing and Immobilizing Vehicles and Vessels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 133
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 133
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2020-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H133 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1250103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12501047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16604465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71378Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71507Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback