FL S1324 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that the audited actual experience of a nursing home or its home office is the actual financial experience for purposes of annual financial reporting to the Agency for Health Care Administration, etc.
Title
Nursing Home Financial Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Rules |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H539 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-49
H1237 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H1237 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy