FL S1320 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a student who is eligible to receive a certificate of completion to remain in high school for an additional year to earn a standard diploma or an occupational certificate of completion, etc.
Title
Occupational Certificate of Completion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1320 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1320/BillText/Filed/HTML |