FL S1314 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting the requirement that the Department of Economic Opportunity manage certain activities related to the commercialization of specified products, services, and ideas; redesignating the Institute for the Commercialization of Public Research as the Institute for Commercialization of Florida Technology; requiring that certain proceeds be returned to the Florida Technology Seed Capital Fund after the payment of certain costs and fees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Capital Formation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HouseIn Messages
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-22SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-02-07SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1181 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H1285 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-139

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889623Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28896255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889627Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback