FL S1306 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring licensed child-placing agencies to maintain a specified registry; requiring that certain information be removed from the registry under certain circumstances; prohibiting the child-placing agency from transferring certain costs to prospective adoptive parents; requiring licensed child-placing agencies to immediately place a surrendered newborn infant in the physical custody of an identified prospective adoptive parent; providing that the prospective adoptive parent becomes the guardian of such infant under certain conditions for a certain period of time; providing requirements for licensed child-placing agencies once they take physical custody of a surrendered newborn infant, etc.
Title
Placement of Surrendered Newborn Infants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1339 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 0423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |