FL S1302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting the authorization for consumer reporting agencies to charge specified fees to consumers electing to place, remove, or temporarily lift a security freeze on their consumer reports; deleting the authorization for consumer reporting agencies to charge a specified fee to representatives of protected consumers electing to place a security freeze on such consumer's consumer reports, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Report Security Freezes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 953
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted HB 953
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-12SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H953 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-62

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5010051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback