FL S1298 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a prolific juvenile offender be held in secure detention until a detention hearing is held if the juvenile violated the conditions of nonsecure detention; requiring a court to receive and consider a predisposition report before committing a child if the court determines that adjudication and commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice is appropriate; requiring that a board of directors for the department's direct-support organization be appointed according to the organization's established bylaws, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1552 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-86
H1417 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1552
S942 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985672Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback