FL S1286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the statewide emergency communications E911 system plan developed by the Division of Telecommunications within the Department of Management Services to include a provision requiring the retention by the public agency of electronic and written emergency communications for a specified period, etc.
Title
Records Retention for Emergency Communications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1286 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1286/BillText/Filed/HTML |