FL S1286 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain licensed facilities to provide to victims of sexual assault information regarding emergency contraception and its availability, if requested, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment of Sexual Assault Victims

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback