FL S1286 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Children and Family Services to retain and reinvest federal performance incentive awards and recognize achievement through salary bonus payments under certain circumstances.
Title
DCFS/Salary Bonus Payments [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Nan Rich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00092 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1089 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Appropriations (CGHC)