FL S1284 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "first responder" to include law enforcement officers, correctional officers, firefighters, emergency medical technicians, or paramedics whose injuries are certified by their employing organizations to be caused by service in the line of duty on September 11, 2001, in New York City while responding to terrorist attacks, etc.
Title
Homestead Exemption for Disabled First Responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1284 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1284/BillText/Filed/HTML |