FL S1284 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "renewable feedstocks." Exempts certain biodiesel manufacturers from bonding requirements. Exempts certain biodiesel manufacturers from specific taxes on diesel fuel. Redefines the term "pollutants" to exclude certain biodiesel. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to adopt emergency rules to implement the provisions of the act.
Title
Biodiesel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time -SJ 484 | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-12 | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/12/11, 9:15 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-24 | Now in Commerce and Tourism -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-21 | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-16 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/21/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 95 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 95 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
206 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 874 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |