FL S1278 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "biosolids"; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to adopt rules for biosolids management which meet certain requirements; authorizing a county or municipality to enact or retain in effect certain ordinances, moratoriums, or regulations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biosolids Management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H405 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4030855Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback