FL S1278 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring railroad companies to provide walkways adjacent to certain sections of tracks by a specified date; specifying requirements for the walkways; authorizing the Department of Transportation to grant waivers under certain circumstances; requiring a party alleging a violation to make a reasonable, good faith attempt at addressing the alleged violation with the railroad company; authorizing the department to impose a fine, etc.
Title
Railroad Walkways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1123 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1278 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1278/BillText/Filed/HTML |