FL S1276 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain requirements must be met before adopting the regulation of an unregulated profession or occupation or the substantial expansion of regulation of a regulated profession or occupation; requiring the proponents of legislation that proposes such regulation to provide certain information to the state agency that would have jurisdiction over the proposed regulation and to the Legislature by a certain date; requiring such state agency to provide certain information to the Legislature within a specified timeframe; providing an exception, etc.
Title
Legislative Review of Proposed Regulation of Unregulated Functions
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1185 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1276 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1276/BillText/Filed/HTML |