FL S1270 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a certain application to provide the applicant with the option to fulfill any court-ordered financial obligation associated with a case by enrolling in a payment plan or by completing community service if ordered by the court; revising requirements relating to the payment of court-related fines or other monetary penalties, fees, charges, and costs; authorizing the clerk to refer any application believed to be fraudulent to the court for review; prohibiting the suspension of a person's driver license solely for failure to pay certain financial obligations if the person requests a hearing and demonstrates specified circumstances to the court, after notice of a penalty and before the suspension takes place; requiring a court to inquire at the time a certain civil penalty is ordered whether the person is able to pay it, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalties and Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-18SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H731 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-134
S350 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
H1029 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S1288 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1095 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
562111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8120155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
877112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93830Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback