FL S1270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying liability for compensatory damages for the injury or death of a pet, etc.
Title
Compensatory Damages for Injury or Death of a Pet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Agriculture |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Agriculture; Rules |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1067 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
H497 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S690 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H497 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S690 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Withdrawn from further consideration