FL S1270 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises the alternative high school course credit pilot project to include up to five school districts beginning in the 2012-2013 school year. Conforms dates for implementation. Provides additional courses for which alternative credit may be earned and end-of-course assessments approved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative High School Course Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 94
2011-03-07 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 94
2011-02-22 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002375Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback