FL S1268 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining the term "urban agriculture" to include new commercial agricultural uses, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban Agriculture Pilot Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Rules
2023-03-29SenateNow in Rules
2023-03-29SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
2023-03-13SenateNow in Community Affairs
2023-03-13SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-03-06SenateReferred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
2023-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1195 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60440Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60450Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60473Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback