FL S1268 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the course and examination requirements for qualified physicians and medical directors; prohibiting the Department of Health from renewing the license of a medical marijuana treatment center under certain circumstances; revising advertising requirements for medical marijuana treatment centers to prohibit radio and television advertising; prohibiting certified medical marijuana testing laboratories and specified individuals from having economic interest in or financial relationships with medical marijuana treatment centers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-05SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2021-12-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H679 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H333 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H693 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S164 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
S326 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
S768 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
H1167 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1906 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
H1585 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9161085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94447Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985711Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback