FL S1262 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1567
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1567
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring county emergency management directors to meet specified qualifications; requiring such directors to meet such qualifications by a specified date, etc.
Title
Qualifications for County Emergency Management Directors
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Jay Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1567 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1567 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1567 (Same As) 2024-05-17 - Chapter No. 2024-193