FL S1260 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the elements that constitute the capital offense of murder in the first degree; providing criminal penalties for persons who unlawfully distribute, deliver, sell, or dispense controlled substances that are proven to be the proximate cause of, or a contributing factor in, the injury or overdose of a user of such substances; providing enhanced criminal penalties for second or subsequent convictions of such offenses; prohibiting specified activities involving controlled substances within 1,000 feet of additional specified facilities, etc.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H325 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1260 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1260/BillText/Filed/HTML |