FL S1260 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1051 (Ch. 2016-96)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting overnight anchoring or mooring of vessels in specified anchoring limitation areas; providing for the removal and impoundment of vessels under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anchoring Limitation Areas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-04SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1051 (Ch. 2016-96)
2016-03-04SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1051
2016-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16
2016-02-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-02-29SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2016-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2016-02-25SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2016-02-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2016-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2016-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2016-02-18SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2016-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-17SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2016-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/17/16, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2016-01-11SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2015-12-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1051 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-96

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3274107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32770Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback