FL S1260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the list of controlled substances in Schedules I, II, III, IV, and V. Provides that the salts, isomers, or salts of isomers are included within certain substances listed in Schedule III.
Title
Controlled Substances [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00550; Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00550 | |
2010-04-08 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 00523; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 412-K | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Health Regulation; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00090 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Health Regulation; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-01-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0873 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)