FL S1256 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the exceptions to conduct that constitute unlawful access to stored communications; authorizing an investigative or law enforcement officer to apply to a judge of competent jurisdiction for a warrant, rather than an order, authorizing real-time location tracking or acquisition of historical location data; authorizing any investigative or law enforcement officer who is specially designated by certain persons and who makes specified determinations to engage in real-time location tracking if a warrant is later obtained as specified, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Search of the Content, Information, and Communications of Cellular Phones, Portable Electronic Communication Devices, and Microphone-enabled Household Devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-07HouseIn Messages
2018-03-07SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (739040) 764
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-26SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1249 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H581 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-93
S618 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
92605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93426Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93442Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/Amendment/340722/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/Amendment/733044/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/Amendment/739040/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/Amendment/834904/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1256/Vote/SenateVote_s01256e1019.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback