FL S1254 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Auditory Oral-Education Act." Revises provisions relating to public school choice options for parents of public school students to include auditory-oral education programs. Provides that a parent of a child who is deaf or hard of hearing may enroll the child in an auditory-oral education program at a school accredited by OPTION Schools, Inc., or at a school in which the supervisor and the majority of faculty are certified as Listening and Spoken Language Specialists by the AG Bell Academy for Listening and Spoken Language, etc.
Title
Auditory-oral Education Programs
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | Senate Education Pre-K - 12 Committee | Sen. Garrett Richter [R] | Sen. Stephen Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 637 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 568 | |
2011-04-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-25 | Favorable by Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-13 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-08 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 473 | |
2011-04-07 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 461 | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 258 | |
2011-03-21 | Now in Budget -SJ 236 | |
2011-03-18 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-17 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 236 | |
2011-03-14 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/17/11, 1:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 93 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 93 | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0937 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |