FL S1254 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01190; Amendment(s) adopted (496282) -SJ 01190; Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01190; Amendment(s) adopted (496282) -SJ 01190; Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the State Constitution to reduce from 10 percent to 5 percent the limitation on annual assessment increases applicable to nonhomestead real property, provide an additional homestead exemption for new owners of homestead property and application and limitations with respect thereto.
Title
Property/Annual Assessment/Exemption [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Crist [R] | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01190; Amendment(s) adopted (496282) -SJ 01190; Died on Calendar | |
2010-04-29 | Withdrawn from Finance and Tax -SJ 01035; Now in Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 01035; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 01035; Now in Rules; Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 01035; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01096; Amendment(s) adopted (857210) -SJ 01096; Ordered engrossed -SJ 01096 | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00279 | |
2010-03-18 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 11 NAYS 0; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00286 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00090; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K --Not considered | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-01-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0655 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
007 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
007 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
012 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
012 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
012 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |