FL S1248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision prohibiting the return of a pistol or firearm taken by any officer, with or without a search warrant, upon a view by the officer of a breach of the peace, etc.
Title
Breach of the Peace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/17/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Rules |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6013 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
321 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
933 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |