FL S1246 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity, in consultation with other organizations, to create the Florida Unique Abilities Partner program; requiring the department, in consultation with the disability community, to develop a logo for business entities designated as Florida Unique Abilities Program Partners; requiring the department to adopt guidelines and requirements for use of the logo; requiring the department to maintain a website with specified information; requiring the department and CareerSource Florida, Inc., to identify employment opportunities posted by employers that receive the Florida Unique Abilities Partner designation on the workforce information system; providing report requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individuals with Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-26SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-26SenateCS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-23SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-17SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2015-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/19/15, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2015-03-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-10SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/10/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-02SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7099 (Similar To) 2015-03-27 - On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback