FL S1244 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a law enforcement agency to issue and serve a subpoena in an investigation of an offense involving the sexual exploitation or abuse of a child, an offense involving an unregistered sex offender, or other specified offenses; prohibiting the recipient of a subpoena from disclosing its contents to another person under certain circumstances; authorizing the issuer of the subpoena to seek enforcement of the subpoena in a court of competent jurisdiction, etc.
Title
Subpoenas in Investigations of Sexual Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1429 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
H7049 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2017-115)
S972 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
H7049 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2017-115)
S972 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1244 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1244/BillText/Filed/HTML |