FL S1242 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that specified provisions relating to the carrying of weapons and firearms do not apply to persons engaged in, traveling to, or returning from certain outdoor activities or traveling to or returning from certain motor vehicles, residences, shelters, and other places, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carrying of Weapons and Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-12-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H739 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79025Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback